LA HB521 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to partitions of property
Title
Provides relative to partitions of property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 521 FINAL PASSAGE (#70) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |