LA HB52 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of unwarranted video surveillance of residential property (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the crime of unwarranted video surveillance of residential property (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-11 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/11/2022. |
2022-02-07 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-07 | House | Prefiled. |