LA HB52 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an increase in court costs in the Traffic Court of New Orleans (EN +$2,100,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for an increase in court costs in the Traffic Court of New Orleans (EN +$2,100,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 52, FINAL PASSAGE (#298) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 52, FINAL PASSAGE (#114) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 52, FINAL PASSAGE (#41) (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 52, FINAL PASSAGE (#114) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 52, FINAL PASSAGE (#41) (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 4. | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-05-31 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-26 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-26 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-05-26 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Notice given. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | |
2011-05-04 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 22. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2011. | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably (9-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-03-25 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/25/2011. | |
2011-03-25 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-03-25 | Prefiled. |