LA HB518 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the sentencing of habitual offenders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the sentencing of habitual offenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#988) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 518 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 57TH DAY (#983) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 2/3 vote (#967) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 2/3 vote (#957) (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#490) (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 386.
2019-06-06HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-05SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
2019-06-04HouseBy a vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2019-06-04SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays.
2019-06-04SenateRead by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day by a vote of 22 yeas and 10 nays.
2019-06-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-06-04SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead by Title. Committee Amendments were rejected. Floor amendments adopted.
2019-05-14HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB518&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122139
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134205
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136839
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143193
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144621
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131145
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131916
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133355
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134921
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122176
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134224
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136895
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145430
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136831
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142616
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142681
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142710
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143112

Bill Comments

feedback