LA HB511 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Louisiana Cybersecurity Talent Initiative Fund for the purpose of funding degree and certificate programs in cybersecurity fields and the Cybersecurity Education Management Council to advise relative to the fund (RE INCREASE SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Louisiana Cybersecurity Talent Initiative Fund for the purpose of funding degree and certificate programs in cybersecurity fields and the Cybersecurity Education Management Council to advise relative to the fund (RE INCREASE SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 511 FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably (21-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB511&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122122
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129201
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134558
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130181
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122133
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128600
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129793
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130228
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134724
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136067
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134530

Bill Comments

feedback