LA HB511 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the election districts for the election of members to the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education
Title
Provides relative to the election districts for the election of members to the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/28/2011. | |
2011-04-27 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-04-27 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |