LA HB510 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Becomes HB 615.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Becomes HB 615.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain voluntary health, safety, and environmental audits by facilities subject to regulation by the Department of Environmental Quality (OR +$621,517 SD EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes certain voluntary health, safety, and environmental audits by facilities subject to regulation by the Department of Environmental Quality (OR +$621,517 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Becomes HB 615. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported by substitute (13-3). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |