LA HB51 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 97 yeas, 2 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 97 yeas, 2 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to vehicular homicide
Title
Provides relative to vehicular homicide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 51 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1524) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#167) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#167) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 97 yeas, 2 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2022. |
2022-03-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-11 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/11/2022. |
2022-02-07 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-07 | House | Prefiled. |