LA HB51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the admissibility of evidence for failure to wear a safety belt
Title
Provides relative to the admissibility of evidence for failure to wear a safety belt
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#11) (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19. |
2019-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported with amendments (5-2). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-03-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019. |
2019-03-08 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-03-08 | House | Prefiled. |