LA HB51 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 05/28/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 05/28/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exception from dual officeholding laws to allow a certified public accountant to hold an office on a school board and employment with a sheriff to provide financial or accounting services
Title
Provides an exception from dual officeholding laws to allow a certified public accountant to hold an office on a school board and employment with a sheriff to provide financial or accounting services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 51 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1234) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#739) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#44) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#739) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#44) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-28 | House | Effective date: 05/28/2018. |
2018-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 536. |
2018-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-15 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2018. |
2018-02-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-02 | House | Prefiled. |