LA HB508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the process for appointments to the Morgan City Harbor and Terminal District
Title
Revises the process for appointments to the Morgan City Harbor and Terminal District
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 508 FINAL PASSAGE (#220) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |