LA HB503 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to civil service systems in certain cities and parishes
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to civil service systems in certain cities and parishes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2016-05-24 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |