LA HB503 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Jonesville to levy a sales and use tax (EN +$360,144 LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the town of Jonesville to levy a sales and use tax (EN +$360,144 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#847) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2015. |
2015-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 339. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015. |
2015-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |