LA HB503 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the official state book

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the official state book

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2014-04-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2014.
2014-04-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-14HouseReported with amendments (8-5).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2014-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2014-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback