LA HB5 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the interruption of prescription
Title
Provides relative to the interruption of prescription
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 5 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1130) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#129) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#129) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 443. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/18. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported favorably (5-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018. |
2018-01-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-01-22 | House | Prefiled. |