LA HB5 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to meetings of state and statewide retirement system boards and committees (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides relative to meetings of state and statewide retirement system boards and committees (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 5, FINAL PASSAGE (#277) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-04-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/9/2012. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-23 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-23 | Prefiled. |