LA HB496 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Effective date: 05/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Effective date: 05/28/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to wine and malt beverage permits
Title
Provides relative to wine and malt beverage permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 496 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#911) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#712) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#712) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Effective date: 05/28/2014. |
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 245. |
2014-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-14 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2014-05-13 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-05-08 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/13/2014. |
2014-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |