LA HB495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an overweight permit to transport earthen materials for government funded levee projects (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates an overweight permit to transport earthen materials for government funded levee projects (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#402) (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 7. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (8-7). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |