LA HB495 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Levies a state tax on the net gaming proceeds of fantasy sports contests, dedicates the avails of the tax, and authorizes a fee for issuance of certain licenses or permits (EG +$346,500 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levies a state tax on the net gaming proceeds of fantasy sports contests, dedicates the avails of the tax, and authorizes a fee for issuance of certain licenses or permits (EG +$346,500 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#430) (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 28. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-20HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-14HouseNotice given.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-01HouseNotice removed
2019-05-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19.
2019-04-24HouseNotice given.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB495&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122095
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125084
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124654
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124797
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125629
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135847
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122111
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124638
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125193
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125789
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135911

Bill Comments

feedback