LA HB495 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to concealed carry of firearms for qualified retired law enforcement officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to concealed carry of firearms for qualified retired law enforcement officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#1012) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#368) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-25HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 507.
2018-05-15HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-10SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-09SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-04-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18.
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-04HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB495&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072262
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082887
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085654
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095782
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102029
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083836
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072283
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083183
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085722
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085535
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095725

Bill Comments

feedback