LA HB495 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 06/22/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 06/22/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of certain state property in Bossier Parish
Title
Authorizes the transfer of certain state property in Bossier Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 495 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#840) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#742) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#84) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#742) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#84) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Effective date: 06/22/17. |
2017-06-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 350. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/17. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |