LA HB495 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the authority to investigate and make arrests for certain crimes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the authority to investigate and make arrests for certain crimes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 495 ADOPT (#1712) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 495 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1579) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 495 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1046) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#936) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#510) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-23HouseEffective date: August 1, 2014.
2014-06-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 820.
2014-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2014-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014.
2014-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2014-06-02HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2014-06-02SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2014-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2014-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2014-05-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
2014-05-29SenateConference committee report received.
2014-05-28HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2014-05-21HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2014-05-21SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Heitmeier, and Martiny.
2014-05-20SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2014-05-20SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2014-05-20HouseHouse conferees appointed: Adams, Ponti, and St. Germain.
2014-05-20HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2014-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
2014-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2014-05-13SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-08SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-05-07SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-05-06SenateReported favorably.
2014-04-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2014-04-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2014-04-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2014.
2014-04-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-14HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2014-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2014-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=HB495&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=877875
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893195
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=913082
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=916084
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=901587
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905109
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=906161
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=877947
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893553
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909560
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=916961
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=895344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=903370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912112

Bill Comments

feedback