LA HB492 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to eminent domain
Title
Provides relative to eminent domain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 492 FINAL PASSAGE (#540) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-16 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-04-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |