LA HB492 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the prescriptive period for certain actions for abuse of a minor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the prescriptive period for certain actions for abuse of a minor

Sponsors

Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]
Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]
Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]
Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]
Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. John Illg [R]
Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]
Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]
Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Laurie Schlegel [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. Francis Thompson [D]
Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]
Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]
Sen. Rick Ward [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 492 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1232) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 492 to Consider (#1231) (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 492 ADOPT (#1103) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 492 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1232) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 492 to Consider (#1231) (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 492 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1122) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 492 CO-AUTHORS (#853) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 492 FINAL PASSAGE (#852) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 492 FINAL PASSAGE (#349) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: 06/14/2021.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 322.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-10HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Henry, Luneau, and Peacock.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hughes, Gregory Miller, and Pressly.
2021-06-08SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-26SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-25SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported with amendments (10-0-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB492&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211585
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220046
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223486
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234648
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235638
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219689
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220006
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221071
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228038
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232081
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211598
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220208
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223547
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228217
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232513
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232335
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234430
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234512
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234695
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234720

Bill Comments 750

feedback