LA HB492 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the compensation of persons wrongfully convicted (RE +$543,989 SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the compensation of persons wrongfully convicted (RE +$543,989 SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 492 FINAL PASSAGE (#525) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 492 FINAL PASSAGE (#488) (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-22HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-22HouseRules suspended.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2019-05-22HouseRules suspended.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 52, nays 31. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (13-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB492&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122089
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130015
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137019
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128756
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129309
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129931
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130666
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122104
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130333
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130522
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137078
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137296
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136815
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137010

Bill Comments

feedback