LA HB491 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the automatic reduction in individual income tax rates and the corporation franchise tax rate if certain revenue thresholds are met (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Title
Repeals the automatic reduction in individual income tax rates and the corporation franchise tax rate if certain revenue thresholds are met (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |