LA HB491 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the regulation of industrial hemp (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the regulation of industrial hemp (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 491 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#904) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 491 FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 491 FINAL PASSAGE (#196) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseEffective date: See Act.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 164.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-28SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-22SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-21SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-05-08SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-07HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB491&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122086
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127741
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132192
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142228
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143697
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127195
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127562
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128324
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129176
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136132
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137120
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137116
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137274
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138014
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138064
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138897
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141817
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141990
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122157
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126052
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127974
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130903
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132332
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135774
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136180
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143196
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1147251
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140903

Bill Comments

feedback