LA HB490 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for procedures and guidance regarding voter registration activities
Title
Provides for procedures and guidance regarding voter registration activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 490 FINAL PASSAGE (#507) (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023. |
2023-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023. |
2023-05-11 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023. |
2023-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (7-4-1). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |