LA HB490 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Advisory Council on Heroin and Opioid Prevention and Education (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Advisory Council on Heroin and Opioid Prevention and Education (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] | Rep. John Bagneris [D] | Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] |
Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 490 ADOPT (#925) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 490 MOTION TO ADOPT (#907) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 490 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#684) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 490 AMENDMENT # 2226 BY MILLS HB 490 BY LEGER (#463) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 490 FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 490 MOTION TO ADOPT (#907) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 490 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#684) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 490 AMENDMENT # 2226 BY MILLS HB 490 BY LEGER (#463) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 490 FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 88. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2017-06-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/17. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2017-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Luneau, and Gatti. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Leger, Hoffmann, and Moreno. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |