LA HB489 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to hearsay

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to hearsay

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 489 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#963) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#897) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#576) (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 237.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-21HouseNotice given.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (7-3).
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB489&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122081
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124417
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137433
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142722
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144100
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137410
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140306
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141824
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142569
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122140
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124551
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137500
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140327
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141796

Bill Comments

feedback