LA HB489 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Used Motor Vehicle Commission to report information collected by salvage pools and salvage disposal sales
Title
Requires the Used Motor Vehicle Commission to report information collected by salvage pools and salvage disposal sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#233) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/18. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |