LA HB488 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the mandatory reporting of certain crimes of sexual abuse of a minor
Title
Provides relative to the mandatory reporting of certain crimes of sexual abuse of a minor
Sponsors
Rep. Beryl Amedee [R] | Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D] | Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Rep. Nancy Landry [R] |
Rep. Patricia Smith [D] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 488 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1120) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#803) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#803) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 458. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |