LA HB487 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits the amount of adoption fees in certain cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the amount of adoption fees in certain cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 487 FINAL PASSAGE (#879) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 487 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 320.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
2019-05-15HouseNotice given.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback