LA HB487 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a program for education savings accounts for tuition expenses for elementary and secondary schools (RR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates a program for education savings accounts for tuition expenses for elementary and secondary schools (RR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 487 FINAL PASSAGE (#650) (Y: 49 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 44. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered re-reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (10-2). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |