LA HB487 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fraudulent or fictitious identification credentials (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Relative to fraudulent or fictitious identification credentials (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 487 FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 487 FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 487 FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 87. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17. |
2017-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |