LA HB481 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the issuance and possession of drivers' licenses (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the issuance and possession of drivers' licenses (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 481 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1337) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 481 ADOPT (#1347) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 481 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1132) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#975) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-17HouseEffective date: 08/01/2016.
2016-06-17HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 625.
2016-06-08HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
2016-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2016-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2016-06-06HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2016-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays.
2016-06-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
2016-06-05HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2016-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2016-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Bishop, Cortez, and Luneau.
2016-06-03SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2016-06-02SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2016-06-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: James, Havard, and Terry Landry.
2016-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2016-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
2016-05-24HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2016-05-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-18SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-17SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-05-16SenateReported with amendments.
2016-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2016-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-05-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
2016-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-25HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2016-03-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB481&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=981500
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997299
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999912
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010536
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1013212
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997138
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996707
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997493
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=998695
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002873
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004551
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004927
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008126
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1007733
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008686
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=981575
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995059
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997450
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999750
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000058
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002538
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003325
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010154
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011725
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1006463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010421
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010487

Bill Comments

feedback