LA HB48 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: 1/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: 1/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that student identification cards issued by certain postsecondary education institutions meet certain requirements (Item #42)
Title
Requires that student identification cards issued by certain postsecondary education institutions meet certain requirements (Item #42)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#162) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#99) (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#99) (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | House | Effective date: 1/01/2023. |
2020-10-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 19. |
2020-10-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-21 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-09-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |