LA HB479 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to members of state retirement systems, increases employee contributions (EG -$23,600,000 FC GF EX)
Title
Relative to members of state retirement systems, increases employee contributions (EG -$23,600,000 FC GF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2011. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported with amendments (6-4) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |