LA HB478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dedicates a portion of the state sales and use taxes on sales of motor vehicles for transportation projects based on a cost-benefit analysis (EG -$97,300,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Dedicates a portion of the state sales and use taxes on sales of motor vehicles for transportation projects based on a cost-benefit analysis (EG -$97,300,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 478 FINAL PASSAGE (#894) (Y: 42 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 40. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |