LA HB478 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for additional accruals for adult probation and parole officers in the primary component (EN +$7,800,000 APV)
Title
Provides for additional accruals for adult probation and parole officers in the primary component (EN +$7,800,000 APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 478, FINAL PASSAGE (#760) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 478, CO-AUTHORS (#759) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on HB 478, FINAL PASSAGE (#674) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 478, CO-AUTHORS (#759) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on HB 478, FINAL PASSAGE (#674) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-15 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-06-15 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended. Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |
2011-05-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported with amendments (8-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |