LA HB476 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective date: 01/01/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the allocation of funding for the Support Our Troops special prestige license plate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the allocation of funding for the Support Our Troops special prestige license plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 476 CO-AUTHORS (#292) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 476 FINAL PASSAGE (#291) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 476 FINAL PASSAGE (#46) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseEffective date: 01/01/18.
2017-05-26HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
2017-05-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/15/2017.
2017-05-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-05-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-11SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-09SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-08SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-03SenateReported favorably.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2017-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-04-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
2017-04-19HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-18HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB476&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031130
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033942
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035744
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040818
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046112
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033623
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034021
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034800
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035469
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034010
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035814
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1056515
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035720
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040787
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040788

Bill Comments

feedback