LA HB476 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the revision of the La. Trust Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the revision of the La. Trust Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 476, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1285) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 476, FINAL PASSAGE (#1211) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 476, FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-12 Effective date: August 1, 2012.
2012-06-12 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 742.
2012-06-01 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2012-06-01 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-05-31 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-30 Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2012-05-24 Scheduled for concurrence on 5/30/2012.
2012-05-22 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2012-05-21 Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-05-21 Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2012-05-14 Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2012-05-10 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-05-09 Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-05-08 Reported with amendments.
2012-04-09 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2012-04-04 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2012-04-03 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2012-03-28 Scheduled for floor debate on 4/3/2012.
2012-03-27 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-03-26 Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
2012-03-12 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2012-03-03 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
2012-02-29 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2012-02-29 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback