LA HB474 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires additional training for peace officers (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires additional training for peace officers (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 474 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1195) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 474 FINAL PASSAGE (#1021) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 474 CO-AUTHORS (#1020) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 474 FINAL PASSAGE (#552) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 474 PENDING A FISCAL NOTE (#551) (Y: 36 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 474 FINAL PASSAGE (#1021) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 474 CO-AUTHORS (#1020) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 474 FINAL PASSAGE (#552) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 474 PENDING A FISCAL NOTE (#551) (Y: 36 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 495. |
2018-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-16 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/18. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |