LA HB474 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the exemption from severance tax for inactive wells (RE +$22,700,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the exemption from severance tax for inactive wells (RE +$22,700,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 474 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2013-05-09 | House | Ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, House floor amendments adopted. |
2013-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported unfavorably (18-0). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |