LA HB468 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for unregulated services within the Louisiana Cosmetology Act
Title
Provides for unregulated services within the Louisiana Cosmetology Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 468 AMENDMENT # 3025 BY CORTEZ HB 468 BY EMERSON (#849) (Y: 15 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 468 FINAL PASSAGE (#286) (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 468 AMENDMENT # 2534 BY HUVAL MOTION TO ADOPT (#285) (Y: 14 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 468 FINAL PASSAGE (#286) (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 468 AMENDMENT # 2534 BY HUVAL MOTION TO ADOPT (#285) (Y: 14 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and rejected. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17. |
2017-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |