LA HB463 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the definition of "qualified event" or "qualified major event" as used in the Major Events Incentive Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the definition of "qualified event" or "qualified major event" as used in the Major Events Incentive Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 463 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-05-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-13HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-30HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback