LA HB463 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the appointment and terms of municipal officials in Lawrason Act municipalities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the appointment and terms of municipal officials in Lawrason Act municipalities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 463 FINAL PASSAGE (#518) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 463 FINAL PASSAG (#161) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 78.
2015-05-28HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-05-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2015-05-26SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2015-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2015-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2015.
2015-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-04-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-04-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback