LA HB460 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rare Disease Advisory Council within the Louisiana Department of Health (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Establishes the Rare Disease Advisory Council within the Louisiana Department of Health (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 460 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1019) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#712) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#233) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#712) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#233) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 321. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |