LA HB460 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that mammography examinations may be conducted through digital tomosynthesis (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that mammography examinations may be conducted through digital tomosynthesis (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]
Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. George Cromer [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]
Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Edward James [D]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Helena Moreno [D]Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]
Sen. Conrad Appel [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]
Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]
Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Gerald Long [R]
Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]
Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 460 CO-AUTHORS (#1219) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#1218) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#294) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: 01/01/2019.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 494.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-16SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-15SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-03SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2018-05-02SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18.
2018-04-04HouseRules suspended.
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-04HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-03-28HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB460&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071871
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080228
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083671
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098150
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102014
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079479
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080133
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082929
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071881
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079877
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080473
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083694
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086566
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1108438
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083646
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098089
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098091

Bill Comments

feedback