LA HB460 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the state fire marshal to purchase a specified group insurance policy for the benefit of certain volunteer members of fire companies (EN +$500,000 SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state fire marshal to purchase a specified group insurance policy for the benefit of certain volunteer members of fire companies (EN +$500,000 SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 460 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#838) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#720) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#24) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-22HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 346.
2017-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-31SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2017-05-11SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2017-05-10SenateReported favorably.
2017-04-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2017-04-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-04-24HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/17.
2017-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-17HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB460&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031115
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033149
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035338
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049517
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052210
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1032886
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033162
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033454
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045542
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046752
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049456
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031161
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033060
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033280
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033524
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035380
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039810
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046057
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050641
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1054798
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035325
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047756

Bill Comments

feedback